Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission on Access to Tax-Preferred Health and Childcare Savings Accounts for All Marylanders
Sponsored by
Senators Manno, Feldman, and Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission on Access to Tax-Preferred Health and Childcare Savings Accounts for All Marylanders; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Commission; authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Commission to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before January 1, 2018; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1559
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Commission on Access to Tax-Preferred Health and Childcare Savings Accounts for All Marylanders
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM