Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 808
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a judge of the Orphans' Court for Kent County shall receive a salary set by the Kent County Commissioners; establishing that each judge shall receive an allowance for travel expenses in accordance with the county budget; requiring the County Commissioners to pay the travel allowance quarterly; and applying the Act.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0225
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2018
Legislative Date
1/15/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2018
Legislative Date
1/16/2018
Action
Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2018
Legislative Date
2/06/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
20
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/26/2018
Legislative Date
5/26/2018
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 808
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2018 1/15/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Senate 1/16/2018 1/16/2018 Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Favorable Adopted 20
Senate 2/06/2018 2/06/2018 Second Reading Passed 20
Text - Third - Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 22
House 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 23
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 55
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/26/2018 5/26/2018 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 808
Text - Chapter - Kent County - Orphans' Court Judges - Compensation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM