Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Real Property - Right to Redemption of Leased Premises - Forms of Payment
Sponsored by
Senator Brochin
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a landlord or mobile home park owner to require a tenant or mobile home park resident to tender specified forms of payment in order to exercise the tenant's or resident's right to redemption of leased premises under specified circumstances; prohibiting a landlord or mobile home park owner from prohibiting cash payment if specified notice requirements are not met; making stylistic and conforming changes; and making the Act effective on January 1, 2015.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0407 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2014 3/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-401, 8A-1701 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM