Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Administration - Behavioral Health Advisory Council
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Behavioral Health Advisory Council in the Office of the Governor; providing the purpose of the Council is to promote a quality system of care that integrates specified practices and strategies to enhance behavioral health services across the State and to advocate for specified services that promote wellness and recovery for individuals with behavioral health disorders; requiring the submission of an annual report to the Governor and General Assembly on or before December 31 of each year; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1262
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {457275/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {836280/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendment
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2015 2/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments {457275/1 Report Adopted 28
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30
House 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 32
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {836280/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 64
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendment 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 61
Senate 4/10/2015 4/03/2015 Passed Enrolled 61
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 328
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-101, 10-1203, 10-301 through 10-305, 10-312, 7.5-301 through 7.5-305 )
(   9-2801 through 9-2806 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM