Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Government - Heads of Departments and Independent Agencies - Qualifications
Sponsored by
Senator Gladden
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring that a head of a principal department or of an independent agency in the State must be a resident of the State; and applying the Act prospectively.
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0200 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/14/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2014
Legislative Date
2/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2014
Legislative Date
2/04/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/14/2014 1/15/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2014 2/03/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 18
Senate 2/04/2014 2/04/2014 Second Reading Passed 18
Senate 2/06/2014 2/06/2014 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 20
House 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Health and Government Operations 23
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM