Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Kelley, Nathan-Pulliam, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a definition of "disseminate" to exclude providing information to victims of crime or their representatives; altering the purposes of certain provisions of law relating to the Criminal Justice Information System; and requiring the Department of Information Technology to conduct a certain study relating to interfaces used for automated victim notification and to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0269
Introduced in a prior session as: SB1025 Session: 2017 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Victim Notification - Dissemination and National Standards
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-201, 10-203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM