Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Activation of Audio Recording Devices on Vehicles Used for Transit Service - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin and Kittleman
Status
In the Senate - Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Madaleno)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Maryland Transit Administration, on specified transit service vehicles equipped with an audio recording device, from activating the audio recording device; and requiring the Administration to post a specified notice on each vehicle equipped with an audio recording device.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2013
Legislative Date
1/17/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {458573/1
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Laid Over (Senator Garagiola) Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {458573/1
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {458573/1
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Rejected (22-23)
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Second Reading Failed
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Madaleno) Adopted
Proceedings
33
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2013
Legislative Date
2/26/2013
Action
Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Madaleno)
Proceedings
33
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2013 1/17/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Favorable with Amendments {458573/1 28
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Laid Over (Senator Garagiola) Adopted 28
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Favorable with Amendments {458573/1 29
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Special Order until 2/25 (Senator Jones-Rodwell) Adopted 29
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments {458573/1 32
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Committee Amendment Adopted 32
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report Rejected (22-23) 32
Senate 2/25/2013 2/25/2013 Second Reading Failed 32
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Motion Reconsider Second Reading (Senator Madaleno) Adopted 33
Senate 2/26/2013 2/26/2013 Recommitted to Judicial Proceedings (Senator Madaleno) 33
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 7-705.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM