Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Video Lottery Terminal Revenues - Purse Dedication Account - Standardbred Racetrack Operating Assistance
Sponsored by
Senators King, Astle, Benson, Currie, DeGrange, Eckardt, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Jennings, Klausmeier, Manno, McFadden, Peters, and Pugh
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Extending through calendar year 2019 the authorization to use specified Purse Dedication Account funds generated from video lottery proceeds for operating assistance by the Ocean Downs Race Course and Rosecroft Raceway to support a minimum of 40 live racing days at each race course.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0180
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2015
Legislative Date
1/30/2015
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2015
Legislative Date
2/24/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
29
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2015
Legislative Date
2/27/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
33
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/29/2015 1/30/2015 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 29
Senate 2/24/2015 2/24/2015 Second Reading Passed 29
Senate 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 31
House 2/27/2015 2/27/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 33
House 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1A-27, 9-1A-28 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM