Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Elections, in consultation with the Department of Information Technology, to make publicly available on the Internet each meeting agenda, made available at least 24 hours in advance of each meeting, live video streaming, and unedited archived video recordings of open meetings; requiring the State Board to prepare written minutes after each meeting; requiring the Department to provide the staff to the State Board necessary to stream live video of the open meetings of the State Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0071
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/21/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {154135/1 Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Floor Amendment {703121/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
32
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
34
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/27/2019
Legislative Date
2/27/2019
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2019
Legislative Date
3/12/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2019
Legislative Date
3/17/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2019
Legislative Date
3/18/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (130-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2019
Legislative Date
3/22/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/13/2019
Legislative Date
5/13/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/21/2019 2/21/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Favorable with Amendments {154135/1 Adopted 32
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Floor Amendment {703121/1 (Senator Kagan) Adopted 32
Senate 2/22/2019 2/22/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 32
Text - Third - State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 34
House 2/27/2019 2/27/2019 Referred Health and Government Operations 36
House 3/12/2019 3/12/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/22/2019 3/17/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 52
House 3/25/2019 3/18/2019 Third Reading Passed (130-0) 53
Senate 3/26/2019 3/22/2019 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 5/13/2019 5/13/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 486
Text - Chapter - State Board of Elections - Open Meetings - Video Streaming and Recording (State Board of Elections Transparency Act)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-102 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:32 PM