Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Repeal of AIDS Education Program for Persons Convicted of Drug- or Sex-Related Crimes
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing a specified educational program on acquired immune deficiency syndrome (AIDS) for persons convicted of specified drug- or sex-related crimes.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0445
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2017
Legislative Date
1/18/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2017
Legislative Date
2/15/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Public Health - Repeal of AIDS Education Program for Persons Convicted of Drug- or Sex-Related Crimes
Senate 1/18/2017 1/18/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 Hearing 2/01 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Favorable Adopted 22
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Second Reading Passed 22
Text - Third - Public Health - Repeal of AIDS Education Program for Persons Convicted of Drug- or Sex-Related Crimes
Senate 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 24
House 2/15/2017 2/15/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 26
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 200
Text - Chapter - Public Health - Repeal of AIDS Education Program for Persons Convicted of Drug- or Sex-Related Crimes
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM