Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Permanent Partial Disability Compensation - Reversal or Modification of Award
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier, Feldman, King, Lee, Manno, Norman, and Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Applying a specified provision of law relating to the reversal or modification of an award for permanent partial disability compensation to the Workers' Compensation Commission; clarifying that, for purposes of a specified provision of law relating to the reversal or modification of an award for permanent partial disability compensation, the payment of any new compensation awarded is subject to a monetary credit for compensation previously awarded and paid; and applying the Act prospectively.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0504
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0358 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM