Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Retirement and Pension System - Designated Beneficiary Change - Rescission
Sponsored by
Senator Griffith (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing certain retirees of the State Retirement and Pension System to rescind a request to change a designated beneficiary by sending certain notice to the State Retirement Agency before a certain allowance payment normally becomes due; and allowing a retiree who rescinds a certain change of designated beneficiary in a timely manner to receive the allowance payable prior to the change of designated beneficiary, without a certain retroactive adjustment.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0266
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2019
Legislative Date
1/23/2019
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2019
Legislative Date
2/07/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2019
Legislative Date
2/08/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2019
Legislative Date
2/13/2019
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/30/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2019 1/23/2019 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - State Retirement and Pension System - Designated Beneficiary Change - Rescission
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 1/31 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2019 2/07/2019 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Favorable Adopted 22
Senate 2/08/2019 2/08/2019 Second Reading Passed 22
Text - Third - State Retirement and Pension System - Designated Beneficiary Change - Rescission
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 24
House 2/13/2019 2/13/2019 Referred Appropriations 26
House 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 58
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 59
Senate 4/05/2019 3/30/2019 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 206
Text - Chapter - State Retirement and Pension System - Designated Beneficiary Change - Rescission
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM