Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workgroup to Study Access to Obstetric Services
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Conway, Currie, Guzzone, King, Lee, Mathias, Montgomery, Muse, and Nathan-Pulliam
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Maryland Hospital Association, in consultation with the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene, health occupations boards, the Governor's Workforce Investment Board, and specified other entities and parties, to establish a workgroup to study access to obstetric services in the State; requiring the workgroup to develop a specified mechanism to evaluate specified factors and to make specified recommendations; requiring the workgroup to report to specified committees of the General Assembly; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {967273/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
42
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/25/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2015
Legislative Date
4/11/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-1)
Proceedings
68
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2015 3/12/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Favorable with Amendments {967273/1 Report Adopted 42
Senate 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 42
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 45
House 3/25/2015 3/25/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/10/2015 4/11/2015 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Second Reading Passed 67
House 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-1) 68
Senate 4/13/2015 4/06/2015 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 329
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM