Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Residential Real Property Sales - Property Tax Disclaimer
Sponsored by
Senator Shank
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a specified form developed by the State Real Estate Commission in connection with the sale of residential real property to include a specified statement about the possibility of significant differences in the property tax bill previously paid by the seller of the property and the property tax bill of the buyer of the property.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0340
Introduced in a prior session as: HB0450 Session: 2012 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-702 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM