Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juveniles - Restraint and Searches - Limitations
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Benson, Conway, Currie, Guzzone, Kagan, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, McFadden, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, Pugh, Raskin, Rosapepe, and Young
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting the use of mechanical restraints by the Department of Juvenile Services on a child in the Department's custody except under specified circumstances; prohibiting the use of physical restraint on a child known to be in the third trimester of pregnancy or in labor, delivery, or postpartum recovery except under specified circumstances; prohibiting the strip search of a child under specified circumstances; limiting specified searches of a child; limiting the length of time the Department may use mechanical restraints on a child; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2016
Legislative Date
1/28/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2016
Legislative Date
2/08/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/30/2016 1/28/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/05/2016 2/08/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM