Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Condominium Act - Closed Meetings of Board of Directors
Sponsored by
Senator Frosh
Status
In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the purposes for which a meeting of the board of directors of a condominium council of unit owners may be held in closed session.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2013
Legislative Date
2/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/13/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
26
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/18/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading Environmental Matters
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2013
Legislative Date
3/08/2013
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2013 2/12/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 24
Senate 2/13/2013 2/13/2013 Second Reading Passed 24
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 26
House 2/18/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading Environmental Matters 29
House 3/08/2013 3/08/2013 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-109.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM