Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Opioid Maintenance Programs - Licensing
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that specified regulations adopted by the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene include a requirement that the process for approval of a license for an opioid maintenance program include an assessment of the number of existing slots in specified programs in a specified zip code and the number of individuals in need of specified services in a specified zip code, the severity of drug-related crime in a specified zip code, the population at risk of opioid addiction in a specified zip code, and the need for a program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1134
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {907979/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
47A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2015
Legislative Date
3/21/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2015
Legislative Date
3/23/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2015
Legislative Date
3/26/2015
Action
Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/03/2015 2/03/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/23/2015 3/23/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {907979/1 Report Adopted 47A
Senate 3/23/2015 3/20/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 47A
Senate 3/24/2015 3/21/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48
House 3/25/2015 3/23/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 53
House 3/26/2015 3/26/2015 Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM