Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Personal Care Products Containing Synthetic Plastic Microbeads - Prohibition on Manufacturing or Sale
Sponsored by
Senators Conway, Pinsky, Rosapepe, Montgomery, Young, Nathan-Pulliam, Simonaire, Bates, Salling, and Waugh
Status
In the Senate - Conference Committee Appointed
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person from manufacturing for sale or accepting for sale a personal care product or an over-the-counter drug that contains synthetic plastic microbeads on or after specified dates; defining "synthetic plastic microbead" as an intentionally added solid plastic particle that is not biodegradable that measures less than 5 millimeters in size and is used in personal care products for exfoliation, cleansing or cosmetic purposes; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0216
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/09/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {714435/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2015
Legislative Date
3/10/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
39
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2015
Legislative Date
3/12/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
41
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2015
Legislative Date
3/13/2015
Action
First Reading Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
43
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2015
Legislative Date
3/20/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {700317/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2015
Legislative Date
4/01/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/08/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2015
Legislative Date
4/03/2015
Action
Special Order until 4/10 (Delegate Barve) Adopted
Proceedings
64
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Barve) {543026/1 Adopted
Proceedings
67
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2015
Legislative Date
4/06/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-2)
Proceedings
67
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Senate Requests House Recede
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Conference Committee Appointed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/13/2015
Legislative Date
4/07/2015
Action
Senators Pinsky, Montgomery, and Bates
Proceedings
65
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2015 3/09/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Favorable with Amendments {714435/1 Report Adopted 39
Senate 3/10/2015 3/10/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 39
Senate 3/12/2015 3/12/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 41
House 3/13/2015 3/13/2015 First Reading Environment and Transportation 43
House 3/20/2015 3/20/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/03/2015 4/06/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Favorable with Amendments {700317/1 Report Adopted 62
House 4/07/2015 4/01/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
House 4/08/2015 4/02/2015 Special Order until 4/9 (Delegate Barve) Adopted 63
House 4/09/2015 4/03/2015 Special Order until 4/10 (Delegate Barve) Adopted 64
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Floor Amendment (Delegate Barve) {543026/1 Adopted 67
House 4/11/2015 4/06/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (134-2) 67
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Senate Refuses to Concur - House Amendments 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Senate Requests House Recede 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Conference Committee Appointed 65
Senate 4/13/2015 4/07/2015 Senators Pinsky, Montgomery, and Bates 65
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-2001, 9-2002 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM