Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Paint Stewardship Program
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring specified producers or a representative organization to submit a plan for the establishment of a Paint Stewardship Program to the Department of the Environment on or before April 1, 2017, and in accordance with specified requirements; requiring the Department to review and approve specified plans, including a specified assessment, submitted in accordance with the Paint Stewardship Program; prohibiting the sale of specified architectural paint under specified circumstances beginning October 1, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0332
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2016
Legislative Date
1/20/2016
Action
Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2016
Legislative Date
1/27/2016
Action
Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2016 1/20/2016 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/20/2016 1/20/2016 Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 1/27/2016 1/27/2016 Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-1701, 9-1702, 9-1707, 9-1733 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM