Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Health - Prescription Drug Manufacturers - Sales to Wholesale Distributors
Sponsored by
Senator Brochin
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a prescription drug or device manufacturer to submit certain average sales prices to the Maryland Department of Health for each calendar quarter within 30 days after the end of the quarter; requiring the Department to make the average sales price submitted by a manufacturer available on the Department's website not later than 10 days after it receives the average sales prices; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2018
Legislative Date
1/17/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2018
Legislative Date
1/29/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2018
Legislative Date
2/08/2018
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/17/2018 1/17/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Public Health - Prescription Drug Manufacturers - Sales to Wholesale Distributors
Senate 1/29/2018 1/29/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/08/2018 2/08/2018 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-2C-01 through 21-2C-04 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM