Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Dentists and Dental Hygienists - Misrepresentation and Practicing Without a License - Penalties
Sponsored by
Senator Conway
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Board of Dental Examiners to issue a cease and desist order or obtain injunctive relief against a specified person under specified circumstances; establishing that, for a specified cease and desist order, proof is not required of actual damage or that any person will sustain any damage if a cease and desist order is not issued; establishing that an injunction or cease and desist order is in addition to and not instead of specified criminal prosecution or disciplinary action; altering specified penalties; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2015
Legislative Date
2/09/2015
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/05/2015 2/09/2015 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-320, 4-601, 4-602, 4-602.1, 4-602.2, 4-606, 4-607 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM