Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday
Sponsored by
Senator Serafini
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing a subtraction modification under the Maryland corporate income tax for specified dividends included in federal taxable income as a result of a specified repatriation holiday enacted by federal legislation; requiring the Comptroller to provide for the administration of the Act if specified federal legislation is enacted; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0400 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Corporate Income Tax - Federal Repatriation Holiday
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-307 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM