Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Repeal of Sunset
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the termination date of certain provisions of law relating to medical stop-loss insurance.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0412
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Repeal of Sunset
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2018
Legislative Date
1/24/2018
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2018
Legislative Date
2/12/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2018
Legislative Date
2/14/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Repeal of Sunset
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2018
Legislative Date
2/16/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
29
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2018
Legislative Date
3/26/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (138-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/24/2018
Legislative Date
4/24/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Repeal of Sunset
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Repeal of Sunset
Senate 1/24/2018 1/24/2018 Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/12/2018 2/12/2018 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Favorable Adopted 26
Senate 2/14/2018 2/14/2018 Second Reading Passed 26
Text - Third - Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Repeal of Sunset
Senate 2/16/2018 2/16/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 28
House 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 29
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 3/26/2018 3/26/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/27/2018 3/20/2018 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54
House 3/28/2018 3/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (138-0) 55
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Returned Passed 64
Post Passage 4/24/2018 4/24/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 202
Text - Chapter - Health Insurance - Medical Stop-Loss Insurance - Repeal of Sunset
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM