Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Forehand, and Raskin
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Maryland Collaborative Reproduction Act; establishing rights and obligations of specified intended parents who use gamete or embryo donors to conceive a child through collaborative reproduction; establishing rights of a child conceived through collaborative reproduction; establishing that a gamete or an embryo donor is not a parent of a child conceived through collaborative reproduction under specified circumstances; requiring a gestational carrier agreement to be approved by a circuit judge prior to the embryo transfer; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0236
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0792 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/15/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {678076/1
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {678076/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/15/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (42-2)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/15/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/14/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable with Amendments {678076/1 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Laid Over (Senator Reilly) Adopted 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Favorable with Amendments {678076/1 Report Adopted 48
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Senate 3/20/2014 3/15/2014 Third Reading Passed (42-2) 49
House 3/21/2014 3/18/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 54
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-901 through 5-916 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM