Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Civil Action - Wrongfully Selling or Furnishing Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Forehand, Montgomery, and Robey
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a civil action for specified damages may be brought under specified circumstances against an alcoholic beverages licensee or the licensee's employee who sells or furnishes alcoholic beverages to an individual who was visibly under the influence of alcoholic beverages and who negligently drove or attempted to drive a motor vehicle after consuming the alcoholic beverages; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/04/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/03/2014 3/04/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-1901 through 3-1905, 5-105 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM