Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
Sponsored by
Senators Waugh, Astle, Benson, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Mathias, Middleton, Oaks, and Reilly
Status
In the House - Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring that regulations adopted under certain provisions of law regulating behavioral health programs include provisions authorizing a behavioral health program located in a federally designated health professional shortage area to satisfy any regulatory requirement that the medical director be on-site through the medical director's use of telehealth.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2018
Legislative Date
1/18/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/31/2018
Legislative Date
1/31/2018
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {597173/1 Adopted
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2018
Legislative Date
2/19/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
29 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2018
Legislative Date
2/21/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
31 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
32 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/09/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2018 1/18/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
Senate 1/31/2018 1/31/2018 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments {597173/1 Adopted 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/19/2018 2/19/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 29 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Behavioral Health Programs - Medical Directors - Telehealth
Senate 2/21/2018 2/21/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 31 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Referred Health and Government Operations 32 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/09/2018 4/09/2018 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM
Click to return on the top page