Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the length of time a school vehicle may be operated in Allegany County and Garrett County from 12 years to 15 years, unless it fails to meet the applicable school bus and motor vehicle safety standards.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0276
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2019
Legislative Date
1/24/2019
Action
Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2019
Legislative Date
2/11/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2019
Legislative Date
2/12/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
24 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2019
Legislative Date
2/14/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-0)
Proceedings
26 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
28 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/27/2019
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2019
Legislative Date
3/19/2019
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
54 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-1)
Proceedings
56 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2019
Legislative Date
3/26/2019
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2019
Legislative Date
4/18/2019
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Senate 1/24/2019 1/24/2019 Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/11/2019 2/11/2019 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Favorable Adopted 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/12/2019 2/12/2019 Second Reading Passed 24 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation
Senate 2/14/2019 2/14/2019 Third Reading Passed (44-0) 26 Click to view Recorded Media
House 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation 28 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/27/2019 3/27/2019 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 3/27/2019 3/19/2019 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 54 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/29/2019 3/21/2019 Third Reading Passed (135-1) 56 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/01/2019 3/26/2019 Returned Passed 58 Click to view Recorded Media
Post Passage 4/18/2019 4/18/2019 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 116
Text - Chapter - Allegany County and Garrett County - School Buses - Length of Operation
(   7-804 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page