Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Astle, Benson, King, Klausmeier, Lee, Manno, Mathias, Middleton, Nathan-Pulliam, Robinson, Rosapepe, Feldman, Hershey, Jennings, and Reilly
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Renaming the Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council to be the Maryland Commission on Caregiving; altering the membership of the Commission to include specified members of the General Assembly; requiring the Governor, when appointing members, to consider groups representing specified individuals such as those with disabilities, disorders affecting an entire lifespan, and those who reflect the diversity of the State; requiring the Commission to provide ongoing analysis of best practices in family caregiver support programs; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0769
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {387179/1 Adopted
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
18
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2017
Legislative Date
2/09/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
20
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/10/2017
Legislative Date
2/10/2017
Action
Referred Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
23
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/11/2017
Legislative Date
4/11/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments {387179/1 Adopted 18
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 18
Text - Third - Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties
Senate 2/09/2017 2/09/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 20
House 2/10/2017 2/10/2017 Referred Health and Government Operations 23
House 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 4/11/2017 4/11/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Text - Chapter - Maryland Caregivers Support Coordinating Council - Renaming and Altering Membership and Duties
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-702, 10-705, 7-301 through 7-305 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM