Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Workers' Compensation - Payment for Controlled Dangerous Substances Prescribed by Physicians - Limitations
Sponsored by
Senator Klausmeier
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting employers or their insurers, except under specified circumstances, from being required to pay under workers' compensation law for a controlled dangerous substance that is prescribed by a physician for covered employees who have suffered accidental personal injuries, compensable hernias, or occupational diseases; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0281
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2014
Legislative Date
1/29/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/29/2014 1/29/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/12/2014 2/13/2014 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-660, 9-660.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM