Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Assembly - Mandated Reports by State Agencies
Sponsored by
The President
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing provisions of law that require State agencies to submit reports to the General Assembly that are deemed obsolete, duplicative, impractical, inefficient, or otherwise unnecessary; combining specified reporting requirements with other more extensive annual reports required to be submitted by State agencies; requiring the Department of Legislative Services, in consultation with agencies of the State government, to periodically review and make recommendations regarding specified reports that may no longer be warranted; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0067
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/02/2015
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/16/2015
Legislative Date
2/16/2015
Action
Hearing 2/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2015
Legislative Date
2/18/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333121/1
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/19/2015
Action
Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {333121/1
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {683826/1
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Special Order until 2/23 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted
Proceedings
27
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {683826/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {356889/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/02/2015 2/02/2015 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/10 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/11 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/16/2015 2/16/2015 Hearing 2/17 at 11:00 a.m.
Senate 2/18/2015 2/18/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Senate Rules
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Favorable with Amendments {333121/1 26
Senate 2/19/2015 2/19/2015 Laid Over (Senator Simonaire) Adopted 26
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments {333121/1 27
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Committee Amendment Adopted 27
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 27
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {683826/1 27
Senate 2/20/2015 2/20/2015 Special Order until 2/23 (Senator Klausmeier) Adopted 27
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Floor Amendment (Senator Simonaire) {683826/1 Withdrawn 28
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 28
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30
House 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 32
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {356889/1 Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (139-0) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Passed Enrolled 56
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-901, 5-704 )
(   5-1002 )
(   10-713, 14-102, 2-123, 3-404, 4-216, 5-315, 5-419, 5-512, 5-555, 6-307, 6-529 )
(   16-106 )
(   2-1107, 9-351 )
(   5-1309 )
(   10-207, 13-1002, 13-1004, 13-1013, 13-1102, 13-1104, 13-2105, 13-21A-02, 13-2504, 15-102.4, 15-124.2, 19-310.1 )
(   10-208, 10-306, 6-708 )
(   11-326, 14-102 )
(   10-219, 10-320, 5-608, 8-422, 9-312 )
(   1-104, 1-706, 3-3A-04, 4-210, 4-210.1, 4-2A-04, 4-746, 5-103, 5-1613, 5-307, 8-1808.1, 8-2103 )
(   14-505, 17-204, 5-7B-09, 5A-403, 7-314, 7-317 )
(   2-10A-03, 2-10A-07, 2-10A-13, 2-1209, 2-506, 9-1405 )
(   21-104, 21-108, 21-123, 21-125.1, 21-128 )
(   10-721, 10-725, 10-730, 10-732, 10-733 )
(   23-203, 6-201.2, 6-210, 8-309, 8-613 )
(   1983, 1984, 1987, 1991, 1994, 1995, 1996, 1997, 1999, 2001, 2002, 2003, 2004, 2005, 2006, 2007, 2008, 2011, 2013 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM