Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned Properties
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Commission to Investigate the Treatment of Lender-Owned Properties; providing for the composition, cochairs, and staffing of the Commission; prohibiting a member of the Commission from receiving specified compensation, but authorizing the reimbursement of specified expenses; requiring the Commission to study and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Commission to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before a specified date; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0728
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2014
Legislative Date
3/10/2014
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/08/2014 3/10/2014 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM