Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
Sponsored by
Senators Lee, Kelley, Muse, Ramirez, Brochin, and Smith
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a specified definition of "convicted of a disqualifying crime" to include a case in which a person received probation before judgment for assault in the second degree, if the crime was a specified domestically related crime.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0294
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2017
Legislative Date
1/19/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {968671/1 Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (26-21)
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/18/2017
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/10/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Frick) Adopted (111-19)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (98-34)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2017 1/19/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {968671/1 Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46
Text - Third - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
Senate 3/20/2017 3/18/2017 Third Reading Passed (26-21) 47
House 3/21/2017 3/18/2017 Referred Judiciary 52
House 3/21/2017 3/21/2017 Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Judiciary
House 4/10/2017 4/10/2017 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day (Delegate Frick) Adopted (111-19) 70
House 4/10/2017 4/05/2017 Third Reading Passed (98-34) 70
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 804
Text - Chapter - Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Definition of Convicted of a Disqualifying Crime
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM