Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Park Heights Redevelopment Area - Alcoholic Beverages - Store Closing Hours
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh and Gladden
Status
In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Setting 10 p.m. as the time on Monday through Thursday at which establishments issued specified Class A alcoholic beverages licenses in the Park Heights Redevelopment Area in Baltimore City must stop selling alcoholic beverages.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0046
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/30/2013
Legislative Date
1/30/2013
Action
Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/28/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {414333/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/01/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
36
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/05/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
40
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/30/2013 1/30/2013 Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/27/2013 2/28/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Favorable with Amendments {414333/1 Report Adopted 36
Senate 3/01/2013 3/01/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 36
Senate 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 38
House 3/05/2013 3/05/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 40
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-302, 11-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM