Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Highways - Prohibition on Outdoor Signs Along Expressways - Exception
Sponsored by
Senator Waldstreicher
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that a certain exception to the prohibition against placing outdoor signs along expressways for on-premises signs that are placed in accordance with certain local zoning laws and ordinances applies to off-premises signs; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2020
Legislative Date
1/17/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Highways - Prohibition on Outdoor Signs Along Expressways - Exception
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2020
Legislative Date
1/20/2020
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/24/2020
Legislative Date
1/24/2020
Action
Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/27/2020
Legislative Date
1/27/2020
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2020 1/17/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Highways - Prohibition on Outdoor Signs Along Expressways - Exception
Senate 1/20/2020 1/20/2020 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/24/2020 1/24/2020 Hearing 1/29 at 2:45 p.m.
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 1/27/2020 1/27/2020 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/21/2020 1:02 PM