Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Calvert County - Sale or Distribution of Tobacco and Related Products - Civil Penalties
Sponsored by
Calvert County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting a person who owns and operates a specified business in Calvert County that engages in the retail sale of tobacco products from storing or displaying a tobacco product in a specified manner; prohibiting a person in Calvert County from distributing a tobacco product to a minor except under specified circumstances, distributing cigarette rolling papers to a minor, or distributing to a minor a coupon redeemable for a tobacco product except under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/02/2015
Legislative Date
2/03/2015
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
16
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2015
Legislative Date
2/10/2015
Action
Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/02/2015 2/03/2015 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Reassigned to Finance 16
Senate 2/10/2015 2/10/2015 Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-1202, 1-1203 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM