Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Bow Hunting - Possession of Handguns for Protection
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, Astle, Brinkley, Glassman, Jennings, Robey, and Shank
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting the Department of Natural Resources from restricting specified licensed bow hunters from openly carrying a handgun under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0262
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0204 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2014
Legislative Date
2/12/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (43-2)
Proceedings
24
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/13/2014
Legislative Date
2/13/2014
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
27
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/05/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/07/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/02/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (120-9)
Proceedings
70
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
66A
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2014
Legislative Date
5/15/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/16/2014 1/16/2014 Hearing 1/28 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 22
Senate 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Second Reading Passed 22
Senate 2/12/2014 2/12/2014 Third Reading Passed (43-2) 24
House 2/13/2014 2/13/2014 First Reading Judiciary 27
House 3/05/2014 3/05/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/07/2014 4/07/2014 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 69
House 4/07/2014 4/02/2014 Second Reading Passed 69
House 4/07/2014 4/03/2014 Third Reading Passed (120-9) 70
Senate 4/08/2014 4/01/2014 Returned Passed 66A
Post Passage 5/15/2014 5/15/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 476
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM