Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Education - Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Curriculum - Development and Implementation
Sponsored by
Senators Robinson and Smith
Status
In the House - Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the State Board of Education to develop curriculum content for a semester-long high school elective course in financial literacy and entrepreneurship; and authorizing each county board of education to implement the curriculum content beginning in the 2018-2019 school year.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2018
Legislative Date
3/14/2018
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 Hearing 1/31 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - State Board of Education - Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Curriculum - Development and Implementation
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2018 3/14/2018 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable Adopted 47
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Second Reading Passed 47
Text - Third - State Board of Education - Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Curriculum - Development and Implementation
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-125 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM