Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Adult Correctional Institutions – Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators Robinson, Manno, Smith, and Klausmeier
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Correctional Education Council, in collaboration with the Division of Workforce Development and Adult Learning and the Director of Education and Workforce Skills Training for Correctional Institutions in the Department of Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, to develop and implement, on or before July 1, 2019, a financial literacy and entrepreneurship pilot program with curriculum to be offered as part of certain transition training to certain inmates in the Division of Correction; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Economic Matters  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/19/2018
Legislative Date
1/19/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2018
Legislative Date
1/23/2018
Action
Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/21/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {807775/1 Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2018
Legislative Date
3/19/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/18/2018
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
52
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Rereferred to Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/19/2018 1/19/2018 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Adult Correctional Institutions - Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Curriculum - Development and Implementation
Senate 1/23/2018 1/23/2018 Hearing 1/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 3/21/2018 3/21/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2018 3/19/2018 Favorable with Amendments {807775/1 Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2018 3/19/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Text - Third - Adult Correctional Institutions – Financial Literacy and Entrepreneurship Pilot Program
Senate 3/22/2018 3/20/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 51
House 3/22/2018 3/18/2018 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 52
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Rereferred to Economic Matters
House 3/28/2018 3/28/2018 Hearing 4/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:34 PM