Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Board of Public Accountancy - Sunset Extension and Program Evaluation
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Department of Legislative Services)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Continuing the State Board of Public Accountancy in accordance with the provisions of the Maryland Program Evaluation Act (sunset law) by extending to July 1, 2025, the termination provisions relating to the statutory and regulatory authority of the Board; requiring that an evaluation of the Board and the statutes and regulations that relate to the Board be performed on or before July 1, 2024; and requiring the Board to submit a specified report on or before October 1, 2013.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0209
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
26
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2013
Legislative Date
2/19/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
28
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
First Reading Economic Matters
Proceedings
31
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2013
Legislative Date
3/24/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/26/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (133-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/01/2013
Legislative Date
3/27/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/02/2013
Legislative Date
5/02/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 26
Senate 2/15/2013 2/15/2013 Second Reading Passed 26
Senate 2/19/2013 2/19/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 28
House 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 First Reading Economic Matters 31
House 3/27/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report by Economic Matters
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 57
House 3/28/2013 3/24/2013 Second Reading Passed 57
House 4/01/2013 3/26/2013 Third Reading Passed (133-0) 59
Senate 4/01/2013 3/27/2013 Returned Passed 58
Post Passage 5/02/2013 5/02/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 212
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM