Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Judgeships - Court of Special Appeals, Circuit Courts, and District Court
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Maryland Judiciary) and Senators Garagiola and Pipkin
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Increasing the number of judges of the Court of Special Appeals from 13 to 15; increasing the number of resident judges of the circuit court in Calvert, Carroll, Cecil, Frederick, and Wicomico counties; and increasing the number of associate judges of the District Court in Baltimore City, and Charles, Montgomery, and Prince George's counties.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0083
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2013
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/18/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2013
Legislative Date
3/11/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2013
Legislative Date
3/12/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
First Reading Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/14/2013
Legislative Date
3/14/2013
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2013
Legislative Date
4/03/2013
Action
Favorable Report by Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2013
Legislative Date
3/28/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2013
Legislative Date
3/30/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (132-5)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2013
Legislative Date
3/31/2013
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/09/2013
Legislative Date
4/09/2013
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/18/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Senate 3/11/2013 3/11/2013 Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 43
Senate 3/12/2013 3/12/2013 Second Reading Passed 43
Senate 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 45
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 First Reading Judiciary 47
House 3/14/2013 3/14/2013 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2013 4/03/2013 Favorable Report by Judiciary
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Favorable Report Adopted 61
House 4/03/2013 3/28/2013 Second Reading Passed 61
House 4/04/2013 3/30/2013 Third Reading Passed (132-5) 63
Senate 4/05/2013 3/31/2013 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 4/09/2013 4/09/2013 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 34
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   1-402, 1-503, 1-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM