Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Transit Administration - Audio Recordings - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsored by
Senators Brochin, Muse, Raskin, and Shank
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring an audio recording device on specified vehicles used by the Maryland Transit Administration to comply with specified requirements; requiring the Administration to post a specified notice on each vehicle equipped with an audio recording device; limiting access to any audio recording that is made on specified vehicles; requiring the Administration to keep a specified log; requiring the Administration, in consultation with the Office of the Attorney General, to adopt specified regulations; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/15/2014
Legislative Date
1/16/2014
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/17/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/15/2014 1/16/2014 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 1/17/2014 1/17/2014 Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-101, 7-705.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM