Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Administrative Procedure Act - Proposed Regulations - Public Hearings and Voting
Sponsored by
Senators Jacobs, Astle, Colburn, Getty, Kelley, Kittleman, Reilly, and Stone
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Joint Committee on Administrative, Executive, and Legislative Review to hold a public hearing regarding a proposed regulation if at least 5 members of the Committee request a hearing; requiring the Committee, under specified circumstances, to vote on whether to oppose the adoption of a specified regulation under a specified provision of law; and requiring that members of the Committee be provided specified notice regarding the scheduling of a specified meeting.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2013
Legislative Date
1/18/2013
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/23/2013
Legislative Date
1/23/2013
Action
Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2013
Legislative Date
2/25/2013
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2013 1/18/2013 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 1/23/2013 1/23/2013 Hearing 2/07 at 1:45 p.m.
Senate 2/22/2013 2/25/2013 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:27 PM