Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage for Ostomy Equipment and Supplies - Required
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring insurers, nonprofit health service plans, and health maintenance organizations that provide health insurance benefits under specified insurance policies or contracts to provide coverage for specified equipment and supplies used for the treatment of ostomies; providing that the required coverage may be subject to specified deductibles and coinsurance; applying the Act to all policies, contracts, and health benefit plans subject to the Act that are issued, delivered or renewed on or after October 1, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0781
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0671 Session: 2014 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2015
Legislative Date
2/20/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/23/2015
Legislative Date
2/23/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
28
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2015
Legislative Date
2/25/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
30
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/26/2015
Legislative Date
2/26/2015
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
32
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2015
Legislative Date
3/31/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {136386/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
3/28/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-1)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Senate Concur - House Amendments
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/14/2015
Legislative Date
4/14/2015
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/19/2015 2/20/2015 Favorable Report by Finance
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 28
Senate 2/23/2015 2/23/2015 Second Reading Passed 28
Senate 2/25/2015 2/25/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 30
House 2/26/2015 2/26/2015 First Reading Health and Government Operations 32
House 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/27/2015 3/31/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Favorable with Amendments {136386/1 Report Adopted 58
House 4/01/2015 3/28/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (138-1) 59
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Senate Concur - House Amendments 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 56
Senate 4/03/2015 3/29/2015 Passed Enrolled 56
Post Passage 4/14/2015 4/14/2015 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 23
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-848 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM