Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Telemedicine - Modifications
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Astle, Conway, Feldman, Jennings, Klausmeier, Lee, Madaleno, Mathias, Pugh, Raskin, Reilly, Rosapepe, Young, Benson, Hershey, and Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Health and Mental Hygiene, under specified circumstances, to include primary care providers in the types of health care providers eligible to receive reimbursement for health care services that are delivered through telemedicine and provided to Maryland Medical Assistance Program recipients; authorizing the Department to require a health care provider to submit a registration form that includes information required for the processing of claims for the reimbursement of specified health care services; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0886
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/21/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2016
Legislative Date
1/22/2016
Action
Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2016
Legislative Date
2/29/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {377379/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/01/2016
Legislative Date
3/01/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
34
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/03/2016
Legislative Date
3/03/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
36
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
First Reading Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
38
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/09/2016
Action
Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/28/2016
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/27/2016
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
56
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/10/2016
Legislative Date
5/10/2016
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/21/2016 1/22/2016 First Reading Finance
Senate 1/22/2016 1/22/2016 Hearing 2/03 at 2:00 p.m.
Senate 2/26/2016 2/29/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Favorable with Amendments {377379/1 Report Adopted 34
Senate 3/01/2016 3/01/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 34
Senate 3/03/2016 3/03/2016 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 36
House 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 First Reading Health and Government Operations 38
House 3/09/2016 3/09/2016 Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
House 3/25/2016 3/28/2016 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable Report Adopted 56
House 3/29/2016 3/24/2016 Second Reading Passed 56
House 3/30/2016 3/25/2016 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 57
Senate 3/31/2016 3/27/2016 Returned Passed 56
Post Passage 5/10/2016 5/10/2016 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 366
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-105.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM