Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019)
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Governor to include the State as a full participant in any regional governmental initiative, agreement, or compact that limits or reduces greenhouse gas emissions from the transportation sector; requiring, beginning November 1, 2019, and for each of the next 3 years, the Departments of the Environment and Transportation to submit a report on the status of any regional initiative, agreement, or compact that limits or reduces emissions from the transportation sector to the General Assembly; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0277
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2019
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2019
Legislative Date
1/25/2019
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/29/2019
Legislative Date
1/29/2019
Action
Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2019
Legislative Date
3/05/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {604939/1
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2019
Legislative Date
3/06/2019
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Lam) Adopted
Proceedings
40 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Committee Amendment {604939/1 Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2019
Legislative Date
3/07/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
41 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/12 (Senator West) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/13/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (33-14)
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/13/2019
Legislative Date
3/10/2019
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation Economic Matters
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
4/02/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments {580112/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2019
Legislative Date
3/23/2019
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2019
Legislative Date
3/24/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (100-35)
Proceedings
59 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Third Reading Passed (30-14)
Proceedings
61 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/29/2019
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/25/2019
Legislative Date
5/25/2019
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/25/2019 1/25/2019 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019)
Senate 1/29/2019 1/29/2019 Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/05/2019 3/05/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Favorable with Amendments {604939/1 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/06/2019 3/06/2019 Motion Laid Over (Senator Lam) Adopted 40 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Committee Amendment {604939/1 Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Favorable with Amendments Adopted 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/07/2019 3/07/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 41 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019)
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Motion Special Order until 3/12 (Senator West) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2019 3/13/2019 Third Reading Passed (33-14) 45 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/13/2019 3/10/2019 Referred Environment and Transportation Economic Matters 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 4/02/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Favorable with Amendments {580112/1 Adopted 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/02/2019 3/23/2019 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/03/2019 3/24/2019 Third Reading Passed (100-35) 59 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Senate Concurs House Amendments 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Third Reading Passed (30-14) 61 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/04/2019 3/29/2019 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019)
Post Passage 5/25/2019 5/25/2019 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 606
Text - Chapter - Regional Initiative to Limit or Reduce Greenhouse Gas Emissions in Transportation Sector - Authorization (Regional Transportation and Climate Protection Act of 2019)
(   2-1204.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM
Click to return on the top page