Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board - School Counselors - Certification Renewal Requirement (Lauryn's Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Pugh, Bates, Benson, Conway, Feldman, Kagan, King, Lee, Mathias, Montgomery, Muse, Nathan-Pulliam, and Raskin
Status
Veto sustained (0-46)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board to require, on or before July 1, 2016, specified certificate holders applying for renewal of a certificate as a school counselor to have obtained, by a method determined by the Board, specified knowledge and skills required to understand and respond to the social, emotional, and personal development of students; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0947
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/01/0001
Legislative Date
1/21/2016
Action
Veto sustained (0-46)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/04/2015
Legislative Date
2/04/2015
Action
Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2015
Legislative Date
3/16/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Favorable with Amendments {764638/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2015
Legislative Date
3/17/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/18/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
45
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/18/2015
Legislative Date
3/15/2015
Action
First Reading Ways and Means
Proceedings
45A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/19/2015
Legislative Date
3/19/2015
Action
Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/01/2015
Legislative Date
4/02/2015
Action
Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2015
Legislative Date
3/29/2015
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
60
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/06/2015
Legislative Date
3/30/2015
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/12/2015
Legislative Date
5/12/2015
Action
Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/13/2016
Legislative Date
1/13/2016
Action
Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/01/0001 1/21/2016 Veto sustained (0-46)
Senate 2/03/2015 2/04/2015 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/04/2015 2/04/2015 Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/16/2015 3/16/2015 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Favorable with Amendments {764638/1 Report Adopted 44
Senate 3/17/2015 3/17/2015 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Senate 3/18/2015 3/18/2015 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 45
House 3/18/2015 3/15/2015 First Reading Ways and Means 45A
House 3/19/2015 3/19/2015 Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/01/2015 4/02/2015 Favorable Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Favorable Report Adopted 59
House 4/02/2015 3/29/2015 Second Reading Passed 59
House 4/03/2015 3/30/2015 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 60
Senate 4/06/2015 3/30/2015 Returned Passed 57
Post Passage 5/12/2015 5/12/2015 Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Senate 1/13/2016 1/13/2016 Motion Special Order vote on veto until 1/20/2016 (Senator Pugh) Adopted
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-704.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM