Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Redistricting Reform Act of 2017
Sponsored by
The President (By Request - Administration)
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Creating the General Assembly and Congressional Redistricting and Apportionment Commission; requiring the Commission to divide the State to create General Assembly legislative districts and congressional districts, as specified; providing for the membership, qualifications, and duties of the Commission; specifying requirements for the adoption of redistricting plans; requiring the Legislative Auditor to establish and administer an application process for individuals seeking appointment to the Commission; etc.
Details
Constitutional Bill
Cross-filed with: HB0385
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
By Request of the Governor
Contingency - on enactment of a constitutional amendment and on a referendum
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Redistricting Reform Act of 2017
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Redistricting Reform Act of 2017
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   8-7A-01 through 8-7A-14 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM