Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Service Credit Purchase Clarification
Sponsored by
Senator Guzzone (Chair, Joint Committee on Pensions)
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Clarifying that a member of the Employees' Pension System or the Teachers' Pension System who is subject to the Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit is eligible to purchase service credit for a specified period of employment under specified circumstances.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Appropriations  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0201
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/02 at 9:00 a.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2017
Legislative Date
2/06/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
19
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2017
Legislative Date
2/13/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
22
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/14/2017
Legislative Date
2/14/2017
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
25
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/08/2017
Legislative Date
3/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/24/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Appropriations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/24/2017
Legislative Date
3/21/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2017
Legislative Date
3/23/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (140-0)
Proceedings
57
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
4/18/2017
Legislative Date
4/18/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Service Credit Purchase Clarification
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/02 at 9:00 a.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2017 2/06/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 19
Text - Third - Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Service Credit Purchase Clarification
Senate 2/13/2017 2/13/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 22
House 2/14/2017 2/14/2017 Referred Appropriations 25
House 3/08/2017 3/08/2017 Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Appropriations
House 3/24/2017 3/24/2017 Favorable Report by Appropriations
House 3/24/2017 3/21/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 55
House 3/28/2017 3/23/2017 Third Reading Passed (140-0) 57
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Returned Passed 54
Post Passage 4/18/2017 4/18/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Text - Chapter - Employees' and Teachers' Pension Systems - Reformed Contributory Pension Benefit - Service Credit Purchase Clarification
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM