Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Agriculture - Easements - Renewable Energy Generation Facilities
Sponsored by
Senator Middleton
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring an easement approved for purchase by the Board of Public Works after June 30, 2014, to authorize the landowner to request approval, under specified circumstances, to use the land subject to the easement for the generation of electricity by a facility utilizing an authorized renewable energy source under specified circumstances; authorizing a written request of a landowner to be approved by the Maryland Agricultural Land Preservation Foundation to amend a specified easement; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0861
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0796 Session: 2013 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/16/2014
Legislative Date
1/17/2014
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/22/2014
Legislative Date
1/22/2014
Action
Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174933/1
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Colburn) Adopted
Proceedings
51
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174933/1
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/18/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {174933/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (44-3)
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
4/04/2014
Action
Rereferred to Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
65
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/30/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (113-20)
Proceedings
66
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/16/2014 1/17/2014 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 1/22/2014 1/22/2014 Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Senate 3/24/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable with Amendments {174933/1 51
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Laid Over (Senator Colburn) Adopted 51
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Favorable with Amendments {174933/1 52
Senate 3/25/2014 3/18/2014 Special Order until 3/26 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 52
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable with Amendments {174933/1 Report Adopted 53
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 53
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Third Reading Passed (44-3) 54
House 3/27/2014 3/22/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/04/2014 4/04/2014 Rereferred to Environmental Matters
House 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable Report by Environmental Matters
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 65
House 4/05/2014 3/29/2014 Second Reading Passed 65
House 4/05/2014 3/30/2014 Third Reading Passed (113-20) 66
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Returned Passed 62
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 287
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-505, 2-509, 2-513 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:29 PM