Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Sponsored by
Senators Bates, Eckardt, Edwards, Guzzone, Hershey, Jennings, Kasemeyer, Klausmeier, Middleton, Norman, Ready, Salling, Serafini, Simonaire, and Waugh
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the day on which interest begins to accrue on specified taxpayer refunds of specified tax payments; requiring a tax collector to pay interest on specified taxpayer refunds beginning on the date of the overpayment if the overpayment is attributable to an error or a mistake of the State or a unit of the State government; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0286 Session: 2016 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/20/2017
Legislative Date
1/20/2017
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
1/25/2017
Legislative Date
1/25/2017
Action
Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 1/20/2017 1/20/2017 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Senate 1/25/2017 1/25/2017 Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/20/2017 3/20/2017 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Favorable Adopted 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Second Reading Passed 48
Text - Third - Tax Overpayment - Interest on Refunds
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 49
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-603 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:33 PM